EP1097979 - Coating solution and method for water-repellent treatment and kit for preparing such solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hiroaki c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | 02 /
Kamitani, Kazutaka c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | 03 /
Kawazu, Mitsuhiro c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | 04 /
Asai, Mitsuo c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza-Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309793.8 | 06.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990314463 | 04.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31446399 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097979 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C09K3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/09] |
Former [2002/05] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Beschichtungslösung und Verfahren zur wasserabweisenden Behandlung und Kit für die Herstellung solcher Beschichtungslösungen | [2001/19] | English: | Coating solution and method for water-repellent treatment and kit for preparing such solution | [2001/19] | French: | Solution de revêtement er procédé pour le traitment hydrofuge et kit pour sa fabrication | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 26.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]JPH05311156 ; | [XDY]JPH0953065 ; | [XDY]JPH10219235 ; | [Y]US5405929 (KOBAYASHI HIDEKI [JP]) [Y] 5,11* column 5, lines 3-5 *; | [XY]EP0846715 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18-20 * examples 1-5; claims 1-3,5,7-10,15 * [Y] 5,11; | [XY]US5808125 (STANDKE BURKHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * column 4, line 38 - line 53; claim 8 * [Y] 5,11; | [XDY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 01, Database accession no. 1994-002378, XP002161417 & JPH05311156 A 19931122 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [XD] 1-4,6-10,12-15,18-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,11 | [XDY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 18, Database accession no. 1997-197397, XP002161418 & JPH0953065 A 19970225 (TOYO RIKEN KK) [XD] 1-4,6-10,12-15,18-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,11 | [XDY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 43, Database accession no. 1998-501926, XP002161419 & JPH10219235 A 19980818 (TOYO RIKEN KK) [XD] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,11 | Examination | EP1022323 |