EP1102501 - Method and apparatus for a wireless telecommunications system that provides location-based information delivery to a wireless mobile unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richton, Robert Ellis 35 Crestview Avenue Morris, New Jersey 07940 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/21] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309824.1 | 06.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | US19990440047 | 15.11.1999 Original published format: US 440047 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102501 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102501 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102501 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2002/37] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für ein drahtloses Kommunikationssystem mit ortsabhängiger Informationsbereitstellung an ein drahtloses mobiles Endgerät | [2009/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for a wireless telecommunications system that provides location-based information delivery to a wireless mobile unit | [2001/21] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour un système de télécommunication sans fil fournissant des informations localisées vers un terminal mobile sans fil | [2001/21] |
Former [2001/21] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für ein drahtloses Kommunikationssystem mit ortsabhängiger Informationsbereitstellung an einem drahtlosen mobilen Endgerät | Examination procedure | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.06.2009 | SE | 17.09.2009 | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/49] | FI | 17.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9741654 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-53 * claim - *; | [X]JPH1013961 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-53; | [X]WO9808314 (GINIGER MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-53 * page 17, line 28 - page 32, line 23 *; | [Y]WO9859506 (TELIA AB [SE]) [Y] 6,7* page 7, line 15 - page 10, line 22 *; | [XY]WO9933293 (GLOBAL MOBILITY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8-53 * column W * [Y] 6,7; | [X]WO9945732 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-5,8-53 * column W *; | US6115611 [ ] (KIMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column W * |