EP1104219 - System and method for data selecting involves transferring VC data representations into an active queue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/22] | Data transmission method and apparatus | ||
[2004/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MMC Networks, Inc. 1134 E. Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joffe, Alexander 3400 Rambow Drive Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310061.7 | 13.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | US19990449146 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 449146 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104219 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1104219 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104219 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5679 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5681 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/03] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Datenauswahl mit Transfer von VC Repräsentationen in eine aktive Warteschlange | [2004/18] | English: | System and method for data selecting involves transferring VC data representations into an active queue | [2004/18] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la sélection de données avec transfer des représentations de VC dans une gestion de file d'attente active | [2004/18] |
Former [2001/22] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für Datenübertragung | ||
Former [2001/22] | Data transmission method and apparatus | ||
Former [2001/22] | Dispositif et procédé pour la transmission de données | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0874531 (MMC NETWORKS INC [US]) [YD] 1,2,6-10 * page 2, line 40 - line 50 * * page 3, line 40 - line 48 * * page 4, line 15 - line 45 * * figures 4A,4B,10,11 *; | [Y]US5535201 (ZHENG QIN [US]) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * column 4, line 45 - line 55 * * column 2, line 21 - line 26 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 6 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 5 * * figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP0874532 (MMC NETWORKS INC [US]) [AD] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0710046 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |