EP1106160 - Infant care apparatus with door/wall latching mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/24] | Door latching mechanism for infant care apparatus | ||
[2005/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datex-Ohmeda, Inc. 3 Highwood Drive Tewksbury Massachusetts 01876 / US | [2006/16] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Datex-Ohmeda, Inc. 3 Highwood Drive Tewksbury, Massachusetts 01876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dykes, Christopher A. 10656 Quarterstaff Road Columbia, MD 20146 / US | 02 /
Hundertmark, Peter K. 8748 Birkenhead Road Laurel, MD 20723 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310255.5 | 17.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19990170145P | 11.12.1999 Original published format: US 170145 P | US20000182137P | 12.02.2000 Original published format: US 182137 P | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106160 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106160 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106160 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61G11/00 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A61G11/009 (EP,US);
A61G11/00 (EP,US);
A61G11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Säuglingspflegevorrichtung mit Tür-/Wandverschluss | [2005/45] | English: | Infant care apparatus with door/wall latching mechanism | [2005/45] | French: | Appareil de soin destiné aux nourrissons et mécanisme associé de verrouillage d'une porte/paroi | [2005/45] |
Former [2001/24] | Türverschluss für eine Säuglingspflegevorricthung | ||
Former [2001/24] | Door latching mechanism for infant care apparatus | ||
Former [2001/24] | Mécanisme de verrouillage d'une porte d'appareil de soin destiné aux nourrissons | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2006 | CY | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | LU | 17.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
TR | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
LU | 17.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB701626 (GORDON ARMSTRONG) [A] 1,3,6,9 * page 3, line 42 - line 51 *; | [A]US4121571 (PICKERING DONALD E) [A] 1,3,6,9 * column 6, line 40 - line 49; figure - *; | [A]US5186345 (CHING AN CHIANG [TW]) [A] 1,3,6,9* column 2, line 8 - line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]IT219405Z (BERTOCCHI GIACOMO) [A] 1,3,6,9 * page 4, line 8 - line 23; figure - *; | [A]WO9912512 (HILL ROM CO INC [US]) [A] 1,3,6,9 * page 5, line 28 - line 32 * * page 6, line 14 - line 18; figure - * | Examination | US4432354 | by applicant | US4936824 | US5453077 |