EP1102219 - Improvements in authentication cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tel+Système Inc. 390 rue St-Vallier Est, Bureau 300 Quebec City Quebec G1K 3P6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Tel+Système Inc. 390 rue St-Vallier Est, Bureau 300 Quebec City, Quebec G1K 3P6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perron, David 5485 rue de Caen, Apt 6 Quebec City, Quebec, G1P 4H9 / CA | 02 /
Yahyaoui, Mohamed 178 rue St-François Est - Apt 1 Quebec City, Quebec, G1K 2Y5 / CA | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Orr, William McLean URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310379.3 | 22.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | CA19992290184 | 22.11.1999 Original published format: CA 2290184 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102219 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06K19/077 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07743 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP);
G06Q20/3552 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Beglaubigungskarten | [2001/21] | English: | Improvements in authentication cards | [2001/21] | French: | Perfectionnements aux cartes d'authentification | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0409241 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE4028966 (GOEDECKE RUDOLF DR [DE]); | [A]DE4406704 (ANGEWANDTE DIGITAL ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5583933 (MARK ANDREW R [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 8, line 10 - column 10, line 48 *; | [A]DE19632197 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2771199 (SAGEM [FR]); | [A]US5969333 (BARTHELEMY SERGE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |