EP1112987 - Gypsum wallboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMNOVA SOLUTIONS INC. 175 Ghent Road Fairlawn, Ohio 44333-3300 / US | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westerman, Ira John 299 Pheasant Run Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US | 02 /
Hardy, Paul A. 3594 Candace Ct. Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US | 03 /
Zorska, Roman 4113 Silsby Road University Heights, Ohio 44118 / US | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310395.9 | 23.11.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | US19990464174 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: US 464174 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1112987 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1112987 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112987 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/14, E04C2/04 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
C04B28/14 (EP);
E04C2/043 (EP);
C04B2111/0062 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B24/161 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B24/2676 (EP) |
Former IPC [2001/27] | C04B28/14, E04C2/04, // (C04B28/14, 24:26) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gipsplatte | [2001/27] | English: | Gypsum wallboard | [2001/27] | French: | Panneau de plâtre | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | IE | 23.11.2010 | LU | 23.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 23.11.2010 | ||
LU | 23.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 23.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5918144 ; | [A]US5688844 (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 57 - line 63 * * column 4, line 41 - line 64 *; | [A]WO9745378 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [A] 1-6,9 * claim - *; | [A]EP0924241 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0020]; claim - * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] *; | [PX]DE19853450 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-6,9,13,18,21 * claim - *; | [PDA]EP1024154 (OMNOVA SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [PDA] 1-4,22* claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 10, Database accession no. 1984-059810, XP002164469 & JPS5918144 A 19840130 (ABE K) [A] 1,13,18,21 * abstract * | by applicant | US5879825 | WO0030991 | EP1133455 |