EP1104692 - Elastically stretchable laminated sheet and process for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toshio, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Tange, Satoru, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Emiko, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310413.0 | 23.11.2000 | [2001/23] | Priority number, date | JP19990334468 | 25.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33446899 | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104692 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1104692 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104692 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, B32B5/14, B32B31/00, A61F13/15, D04H3/14, D04H3/16 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
A61F13/15699 (EP);
B32B5/14 (KR);
B32B7/022 (EP,US);
A61F13/15764 (EP);
A61F13/49011 (EP);
A61F13/4902 (EP);
B32B5/04 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/23] | B32B5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/23] | Title | German: | Elastisch reckbare Mehrschichtfolie und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2004/18] | English: | Elastically stretchable laminated sheet and process for making the same | [2001/23] | French: | Feuille laminé étirable élastiquement et méthode pour sa production | [2004/18] |
Former [2001/23] | Elektrisch reckbare Mehrschichtfolie und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [2001/23] | Feuille laminé étirable électriquement et méthode pour sa production | Examination procedure | 20.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | CY | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | IE | 23.11.2004 | LU | 23.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IT | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 23.11.2004 | ||
LU | 23.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 23.11.2004 | ||
LU | 23.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 23.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 23.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4720415 (VANDER WIELEN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 18 - line 34 * * column 12, line 46 - column 13, line 37 * * column 14, line 19 - line 48; figure - *; | [A]EP0832629 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1* column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 7; claims 1,7 * |