EP1107406 - Spark plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honda, Toshitaka, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Sugimoto, Makoto, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310565.7 | 29.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990341233 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: JP 34123399 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1107406 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107406 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/08, H01T13/20 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H01T13/20 (EP,US);
H01T13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zündkerze | [2001/24] | English: | Spark plug | [2001/24] | French: | Bougie d'allumage | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH11273827 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11273827 A 19991008 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [XD] 1 * abstract * |