EP1108797 - Aluminium-tin bearing alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/25] | Bearing materials | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [2001/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMeekin, Kenneth Macleod Dana Glacier Vandervell, Riccarton, Kilmarnock Ayrshire KA1 3NA, Scotland / GB | 02 /
Massey, Ian David Macleod Dana Glacier Vandervell, Cawston House Cawston Rugby, Warwickshire CV22 7SB, Scotland / GB | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310687.9 | 01.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | GB19990029425 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9929425 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1108797 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1108797 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108797 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, F16C33/12 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
C22C21/003 (EP,US);
F16C33/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aluminium-Zinn Lagerlegierung | [2001/25] | English: | Aluminium-tin bearing alloy | [2001/32] | French: | Palier en alliage d'aluminium étain | [2001/25] |
Former [2001/25] | Bearing materials | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.03.2003 | CH | 26.03.2003 | FI | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | LI | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | TR | 26.03.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | CY | 01.12.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/36] | BE | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | BE | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | BE | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 26.03.2003 | |
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4973523 (NEUHAUS PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5384205 (TANAKA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-21; tables 1,2 *; | [A] - W.HUFNAGEL, Key to Aluminium Aloys, 4. Edition, DÜSSELDORF, GERMANY, ALUMINIUM-VERLAG, (1992), XP002165924 [A] 1-10 * page 264 * | [A] - J.R. DAVIS, DAVIS & ASSOCIATES, ASM Speciality Handbook, Aluminum and Aluminum Alloys, OHIO, USA, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1993), XP002165925 [A] 1-10 * page 631 - page 635 * | [A] - DAVIES, G.J. ET AL, "The Development of New Bearing Materials.", IND. LUBR. TRIBOL. (NOV.-DEC. 1986) 38, (6), 204-213, 237 ISSN: 0036-8792, XP002165923 |