EP1213442 - Rotor blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/24] | Coolable airfoil structure | ||
[2008/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zelesky, Mark F. 931 North River Drive Coventry, CT 06238 / US | 02 /
Mongillo, Dominic J., Jr. 65 Charlene Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310810.7 | 05.12.2000 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213442 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213442 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP);
B22C9/10 (EP);
F05D2260/22141 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rotorschaufel | [2008/40] | English: | Rotor blade | [2008/40] | French: | Aube rotorique | [2008/40] |
Former [2002/24] | Kühlbare Schaufelstruktur | ||
Former [2002/24] | Coolable airfoil structure | ||
Former [2002/24] | Structure d'aube refroidissable | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2007 | Decision despatched | 18.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2005 | Decision despatched | 26.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3527543 (HOWALD WERNER E) [X] 1,7 * figure 8 *; | [X]SU358525 (AVILOVA SHULGINA M V, et al) [X] 1,3,7 * figure - *; | [X]US4180373 (MOORE WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 8 * figure - *; | [A]US5368441 (SYLVESTRO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-9* figure - *; | [X]US5503529 (ANSELMI GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure - *; | [X]JPH09195705 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * page 5, column R, paragraph 45; figure 1 *; | [E]EP1072757 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-9 * figure - * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11 [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | US4278400 | US4474532 | US5368441 |