EP1109310 - Alternator with regulation of multiple voltage outputs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.E. NIEHOFF & COMPANY 2021 Lee Street Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | [2007/22] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states C.E. NIEHOFF & COMPANY 2021 Lee Street Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jabaji, Issam 7646 Church Street Morton Grove, Illinois 60053 / US | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311114.3 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | US19990464919 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: US 464919 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109310 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109310 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109310 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/30, H02K19/34, H02J7/14 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H02K19/34 (EP,US);
H02P9/307 (EP,US);
H02P2101/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | H02P9/30, H02K19/34 | ||
Former IPC [2001/25] | H02P9/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/25] | Title | German: | Wechselstromgenerator mit mehrfachen Ausgangsspannungen | [2001/25] | English: | Alternator with regulation of multiple voltage outputs | [2001/25] | French: | Alternateur avec tension multiple de sortie | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06075620.2 / EP1667318 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | IE | 13.12.2007 | LU | 13.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 30.05.2007 | |
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
IE | 13.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
IE | 13.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 30.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05292717 ; | [A]US3793544 (SCHMITZ N, et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4045718 (GRAY ALDEN J) [A] 8-14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2120865 (IORWERTH THOMAS) [A] 3,4,7 * page 1, line 99 - page 2, line 44; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4788486 (MASHINO KEIICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 *; | [X]US4999563 (SUZUKI TOSHIMICHI [JP]) [X] 1,5 * abstract *; | [DA]US5033565 (ABUKAWA TOSHIMI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0884820 (DURELLI OLINDO LUCA JULIO [AR]); | [XA]DE19752241 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 8,9,11,14 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5,6,10,12,13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940214), vol. 018, no. 088, Database accession no. (E - 1507), & JP05292717 A 19931105 (SAWAFUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * abstract * |