EP1109264 - Terminal protector for multipolar electrical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Controls Iberica, SL Marques de Comillas, 1 08225 Terrassa Barcelona / ES | [2007/10] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Power Controls Iberica, SL Marques de Comillas, 1 08225 Terrassa, Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin Calvache, Ramon Benito Perez Galdos, 3-7o B 28298 Mostolos, Madrid / ES | 02 /
Rodriguez Lafuente, Juan Carlo Antonio Machado, 14-2o C. 28220 Majadohonda, Madrid / ES | 03 /
Fernandez del Rio, Jaime Santa Virgilia, 7-Esc. Dcha. 9 28033 Madrid / ES | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2001/25] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311158.0 | 12.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | ES19990002728 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: ES 9902728 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109264 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109264 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109264 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/44 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H01R13/4534 (EP);
H01H9/0264 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2005/35] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schutzeinrichtung für Kontakte multipolarer elektrischer Geräte | [2001/25] | English: | Terminal protector for multipolar electrical devices | [2001/25] | French: | Dispositif de protection des terminaux de dispositifs électriques multipolaires | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB896119 (BURNDY CORP); | [A]GB2171564 (CRABTREE ELECTRICAL IND LTD); | [A]US4899120 (OHTAKE SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 68 * |