EP1115187 - Three-electrode-discharge surge arrester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machida, Kazuhiko, Shinko Electric Ind. Co., ltd. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311187.9 | 14.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | JP20000000218 | 05.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000000218 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1115187 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1115187 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1115187 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01T4/12 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
H01T4/12 (EP,US);
H01J61/92 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2002/35] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Überspannungsableiter mit drei Elektroden | [2001/28] | English: | Three-electrode-discharge surge arrester | [2001/28] | French: | Dérivateur de surtensions muni de trois électrodes | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4241374 (GILBERTS ALEXANDER G [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 30; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2614145 (C P CLARE ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [A]US5336970 (EINBINDER ITAMAR B [US]); | [A]FR2430083 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |