EP1111611 - Liner bonding process and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kano, Kenichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311391.7 | 19.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990362430 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36243099 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111611 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111611 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/033 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G11B23/0326 (EP,US);
G11B23/113 (KR);
G11B23/0332 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/14] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gleitblattbefestigungsverfahren und -Gerät | [2001/26] | English: | Liner bonding process and apparatus | [2001/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fixation de garniture | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6288190 ; | [A]JPS61162873 ; | [Y]EP0236516 (BORGERS JOHANN GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-8,11 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]US5085723 (NAKAKI MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8,11 * column 5, line 10 - line 25; figures 1-3 * [A] 9,10; | [AP]EP1033717 (SONY CORP [JP]) [AP] 6* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870922), vol. 011, no. 293, Database accession no. (P - 619), & JP62088190 A 19870422 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861210), vol. 010, no. 369, Database accession no. (P - 525), & JP61162873 A 19860723 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [A] 6 * abstract * |