EP1110571 - Needle safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medex, Inc. 2231 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allmon, Butch 983 CR 3673 Paradise Texas 76073 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311424.6 | 20.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19990472353 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: US 472353 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110571 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110571 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/50 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A61M5/3273 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nadelschutzvorrichtung | [2001/26] | English: | Needle safety device | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif de protection d'aiguille | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 26.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/28] | ES | 27.04.2005 | |
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | LU | 31.12.2005 | |
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | MC | 31.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5344408 (PARTIKA LAWRENCE [US]) [AD] 1,11,17,18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0753317 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1,11,17,18 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 50 ** figures 16-18 *; | [A]WO9908742 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,11,17,18 * abstract * | by applicant | US5344408 |