EP1111426 - Near-field optical probe and scanning near-field optical microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/26] | Near-field optical probe and manufacturing method for same, and near-fied optical apparatus using the near-field probe | ||
[2003/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashi, Niwa c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Kato, Kenji c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Kasama, Nobuyuki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Oumi, Manabu c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 05 /
Mitsuoka, Yasuyuki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 06 /
Ichihara, Susumu c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311436.0 | 20.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990361701 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36170199 | JP20000130826 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000130826 | JP20000352778 | 20.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000352778 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111426 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111426 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111426 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G12B21/06 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
G01Q60/06 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01Q20/02 (EP,US);
G01Q60/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | G02B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optische Nahfeldsonde und optisches Scanning-Nahfeld-Mikroskop | [2007/02] | English: | Near-field optical probe and scanning near-field optical microscope | [2007/02] | French: | Sonde à champs proche et microscope l'utilisant | [2007/02] |
Former [2001/26] | Probe für optisches Nahfeld und Herstellungsverfahren hierzu, optisches Nahfeld-Gerät mit solcher Probe | ||
Former [2001/26] | Near-field optical probe and manufacturing method for same, and near-fied optical apparatus using the near-field probe | ||
Former [2001/26] | Echantillon pour un champs proche optique et son procédé de fabrication, appareil optique de champs proche utilisant cet échantillon | Examination procedure | 08.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04078523.0 / EP1519388 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5354985 (QUATE CALVIN F [US]) [X] 1-12,26-32 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0964251 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069]; figures 9,10 *; | [X]US6046972 (KURODA RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 50; figures 1,3 *; | JPH09269329 [ ] (CANON KK); | [X]US5294790 (OHTA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 29; figure 45 * * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 23; figures 1,2,7 *; | [X]US5838005 (MAJUMDAR ARUNAVA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 18; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0880043 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 19-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0846932 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 19-26 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5489774 (AKAMINE SHINYA [US], et al) [X] 12 * figures 1,3A,3B * [A] 13-15 | Examination | US5936237 |