EP1111828 - Method and apparatus for cross-connecting data streams with efficient memory utilization and transparent protocol conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammermeister, Karl H. 63 Peacock Crescent Nepean, Ontario K2J 3N8 / CA | 02 /
Kusyk, Richard G. 7 Craftsman Private Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 4W9 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311463.4 | 20.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | CA19992293066 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: CA 2293066 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111828 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111828 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16, H04Q11/08 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04J3/1611 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | H04J3/16, H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/23] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kreuzschaltung von Datenströmen mit effizientem Speichergebrauch und transparenter Protokolkonvertierung | [2001/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for cross-connecting data streams with efficient memory utilization and transparent protocol conversion | [2001/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif à brassage de flux de données avec une untilisation efficace de mémoire et conversion transparente de protocole | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5282195 (HOOD DAVID F [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,28,29* column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 9 *; | [XY]US5537405 (YOSHIFUJI YUUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,26,27 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 44 * * column 8, line 17 - column 9, line 12 * * figures 2,8 * [Y] 3,4,28,29 |