EP1110744 - Motor control apparatus and motor control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hirotomo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311536.7 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990368029 | 24.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36802999 | JP20000032045 | 09.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000032045 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110744 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110744 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J19/20, H02P7/00, B41J19/78 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B41J19/20 (EP,US);
B41J11/42 (EP,US);
B41J19/202 (EP,US);
B41J19/207 (EP);
H02P23/16 (EP,US);
H02P7/2805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Motorsteuerung | [2001/26] | English: | Motor control apparatus and motor control method | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commande de moteur | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06075410.8 / EP1681173 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | IT | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | IE | 21.12.2006 | LU | 21.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 02.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
IE | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
IE | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
LI | 13.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4216415 (INADA HOROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-45 * column 4, line 15 - column 12, line 40; figures 8,9 *; | [A]EP0465850 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-45* column 4, line 35 - column 13, line 58; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0680829 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 9 * column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 35 *; | [XA]US5926192 (YAMANE TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 2,11,27,29,34-37,41,45; | [XA]EP0945277 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 2,11,27,29,34-37,41,45 |