EP1113359 - Method and system for downloading dedicated applications to user stations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellstén, Harri Kemiankatu 15 B 8 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Kivisto, Kari Honkakuja 9a2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311604.3 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | US19990475359 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: US 475359 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113359 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113359 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F17/60 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
G06F21/101 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Fernladen von zugeordneten Anwendungen auf Benutzerstationen | [2001/27] | English: | Method and system for downloading dedicated applications to user stations | [2001/27] | French: | Méthode et système de téléchargement d'applications dédiées sur des stations utilisateurs | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 05.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/49] | 20.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP06116546.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4408544 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0778512 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 5, lines 46-51 * * column 9, lines 5-9,21-24,47-52 * * column 6, lines 14-22 * * column 8, lines 50-58 * * figures 1,3,5,8 *; | [A]US5835911 (NAKAGAWA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5845090 (COLLINS III THEODORE JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * |