EP1044715 - Medical equipment for concentration/liquefaction of oxygen, which can be used in oxygen therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Liquide Santé (International) 10 rue Cognacq-Jay 75341 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Air Liquide Sante (International) 10 rue Cognacq-Jay 75341 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boissin, Jean-Claude 1030 Montée de Chartreuse 38330 Saint-Ismier / FR | 02 /
Hennebel, Vincent 9 Allée des Acacias 92310 Sevres / FR | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Service Brevets & Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Service Brevets & Marques, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/42] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'Air Liquide S.A., DSPI, Service Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400226.7 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | FR19990004585 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904585 | [2000/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044715 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/047, B01D53/04, B01D53/22, A61M16/10 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
C01B13/027 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4533 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4541 (EP,US);
B01D53/0446 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Medizinisches Gerät zum Konzentrieren/Verflüssigen von Sauerstoff, der in Sauerstofftherapie nutzbar ist | [2000/42] | English: | Medical equipment for concentration/liquefaction of oxygen, which can be used in oxygen therapy | [2000/42] | French: | Equipement médical de concentration/liquéfaction d'oxygène utilisable en oxygènothérapie | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9858219 (SEQUAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-13,15-17 * page 13, line 1 - page 16, line 30; claim 1 * * page 21, line 19 - page 22, line 3 * [Y] 4,5,8,14; | [Y]US4477264 (KRATZ WILBUR C [US], et al) [Y] 4,8,14 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 51 *; | [Y]EP0757919 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 38 *; | [A]US5827358 (KULISH STANLEY [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7-10 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 10 *; | [A]EP0860646 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, line 20 - column 8, line 51 *; | [A]EP0312910 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,9,10 * page 2, line 14 - page 2, line 31 * * page 4, line 5 - page 8, line 16 * |