EP1026025 - Transmission device for mobile engine with at least two serially arranged displacement motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POCLAIN HYDRAULICS INDUSTRIE Route de Saint Sauveur 60411 Verberie / FR | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Louis 25, rue Eugène Jacquet 60200 Compiègne / FR | 02 /
Cousin, Jean-Claude 289, rue Mac Hugh 60700 Pontpoint / FR | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400239.0 | 31.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | FR19990001361 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901361 | [2000/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026025 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026025 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/356, B60K17/10, F16H39/02 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
F16H61/452 (EP,US);
B60K17/10 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
F16H39/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/17] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übertragungsvorrichtung für bewegliche Maschine mit mindestens zwei hintereinandergeschalteten Verdrängermotoren | [2000/32] | English: | Transmission device for mobile engine with at least two serially arranged displacement motors | [2000/32] | French: | Dispositif de transmission d'un engin mobile ayant au moins deux organes de déplacement moteurs en ligne | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 10.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0176427 (POCLAIN HYDRAULICS SA [FR]) [DA] 1; | [DA]EP0547947 (POCLAIN HYDRAULICS SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5328321 (MOFFETT CAROL [IE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 40 - line 66; figures 14-16 *; | [A]EP0816153 (MOFFETT RES & DEV LTD [IE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 53 - line 58; figure . *; | [A]FR2719001 (ECB SARL [FR]) | by applicant | EP0176427 | EP0547947 |