EP1027881 - Photoprotective compositions containing a bisresorcinyl triazine derivative and a compound with benzoazolyl or benzodiazolyl groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Candau, Didier 47 rue de la Martinière 91570 Bievres / FR | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Caillet, Isabelle, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Caillet, Isabelle, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400244.0 | 31.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | FR19990001732 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901732 | [2000/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027881 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027881 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Lichtschutzzusammensetzungen enthaltend eines Bisresorcinyltriazinderivat und eine Verbindung mit Benzoazolyl- oder Benzodiazolylgruppen | [2000/33] | English: | Photoprotective compositions containing a bisresorcinyl triazine derivative and a compound with benzoazolyl or benzodiazolyl groups | [2000/33] | French: | Compositions photoprotectrices contenant un dérivé de bis-résorcinyl triazine et un composé à groupements benzoazolyle ou benzodiazolyle | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE BEIERSDORF AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Wilke, Jochen, et al, et al Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 Brieffach 79 20253 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE BEIERSDORF AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Wilke, Jochen, et al, et al Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 Brieffach 79 D-20253 Hamburg / DE | 17.07.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.09.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/19] | Appeal following opposition | 02.09.2011 | Appeal received No. T1927/11 | 15.11.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 15.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 07.09.2005 | FI | 07.09.2005 | IE | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | BE | 31.01.2006 | CH | 31.01.2006 | LI | 31.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | PT | 07.02.2006 | IT | 31.01.2009 | ES | 02.02.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/19] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
CY | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
CY | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH350763 (CIBA GEIGY [CH]) [A] * page 11 *; | [AD]EP0669323 (HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH [DE]) [AD] * page 1 - page 9 *; | [AD]EP0775698 (CIBA GEIGY [CH]) [AD] * page 1 - page 5 *; | [A]DE19548014 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] * page 2, line 31 - line 57 * * page 2, line 67 - page 3, line 10 * * examples 4,5,8,9 *; | [A]EP0824909 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] * page 3 - page 5 * * page 7, line 56 * * page 9, line 13 - line 36 *; | [AD]EP0878469 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] * page 1 - page 10 * |