EP1028367 - Device and method for improving the write performances of a computer data storage peripheral [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carteau, Daniel 4 rue du Canal 78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | [2000/33] | Application number, filing date | 00400299.4 | 03.02.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | FR19990001649 | 11.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901649 | [2000/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028367 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/20 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G06F11/1441 (EP);
G06F11/1666 (EP);
G11C29/74 (EP);
G06F11/20 (EP);
G06F3/0613 (EP);
G06F3/0619 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2001/18] |
Former [2000/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren für die Verbesserung der Schreibleistung einer Rechnerdatenspeicherperipherie | [2000/33] | English: | Device and method for improving the write performances of a computer data storage peripheral | [2000/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'amélioration des performances en écriture d'un périphérique de stockage de données pour ordinateur | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5594909 (INOUE HIROYUMI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 48; figure 1; claim - * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]EP0721162 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 2-10 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-3; claim - * |