EP1030014 - Three-part lock for a vehicle wing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94000 Créteil / FR | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deblock, Luc 10, rue de Contatre 80970 Sailly Flibeaucourt / FR | 02 /
Sannier, Jean 4, rue de Yaucourt 80132 Buigny-l'Abbe / FR | 03 /
D'Almeida, José 85, route de Nouvion 80150 Lamotte Buleux / FR | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al Valeo Switches & Detection Systems (VSDS) Service Propriété Industrielle Rue Jules Verne Vetraz Monthoux, B.P. 509 74106 Annemasse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Croonenbroek, Thomas, et al Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/34] | Abello, Michel Cabinet Peuscet, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400393.5 | 11.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | FR19990001824 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901824 | [2000/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030014 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, E05B47/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
E05B81/06 (EP,US);
E05B77/26 (EP,US);
E05B77/28 (EP,US);
E05B81/16 (EP,US);
E05B81/34 (EP,US);
E05B81/54 (EP,US);
E05B83/36 (EP,US);
Y10S292/23 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1047 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/19] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dreiteiliges Schloss für einen Kraftfahrzeugflügel | [2000/34] | English: | Three-part lock for a vehicle wing | [2000/34] | French: | Serrure en trois parties, pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/44] | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2656030 (VACHETTE SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0894924 (ATOMA ROLTRA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0103904 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 11 * * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 1 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2212848 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2156422 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5186504 (TAKAISHI TATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 43-60; figure - * |