EP1028364 - Adjustable automobile pedal system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CICOTTE, Edmond Burton 11086 Hedgeway Utica, MI 48317 / US | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2000/33] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Rinuy, Santarelli, 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400404.0 | 11.02.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | US19990250476 | 14.02.1999 Original published format: US 250476 | US20000488970 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 488970 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1028364 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1028364 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/14 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G05G1/405 (EP);
B60K26/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Einstellbare Fahrzeugpedalanordnung | [2000/33] | English: | Adjustable automobile pedal system | [2000/33] | French: | Système de pédale réglable pour automobile | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 30.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3563111 (ZEIGLER PHILIP B) [DA] 1,5,14,16 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 70 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE2247963 (OPEL ADAM AG) [A] 1,5,14,16 * page 8, line 1 - page 15, line 22 * * figures 1-6 *; | [DA]US5351573 (CICOTTE EDMOND B [US]) [DA] 1,5,14,16 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [DA]WO9605547 (CICOTTE EDMOND BURTON [US]) [DA] 1,5,14,16 * abstract * * figures 1-9B * | by applicant | US2250731 | US2550732 | US2860720 | GB952831 | US3151499 | US3282125 | US3400607 | US3563111 | US4683977 | US5010782 |