EP1032169 - System for estimating the complex gain of a transmission channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/40] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laurent, Pierre-André, Thomson-CSF Prop. Intell. Départ. Brevets, 13, av. du Prés.Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [2000/35] | Application number, filing date | 00400513.8 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | FR19990002440 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902440 | [2000/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032169 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032169 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L27/26, H04L1/12 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L25/0222 (EP,US);
H04L25/0232 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03522 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | System zur Schätzung der komplexen Verstärkung eines Übertragungskanals | [2000/35] | English: | System for estimating the complex gain of a transmission channel | [2000/35] | French: | Système pour l'estimation du gain complexe d'un canal de transmission | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 29.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | IE | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
IE | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | GR | 14.12.2005 | |
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | GR | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08149176 ; | [A]GB2247812 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * figures 4,8 * * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 8 * * page 2, line 22 - line 25 * * page 2, line 33 - line 34 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 2 *; | [A]WO9613910 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 21 - line 23 * * page 4, line 4 - line 9 * * page 8, line 14 - line 22 *; | [A]EP0887977 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 26 - line 29 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08149176 A 19960607 (HITACHI) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |