EP1160662 - Processor with pointer tracking to eliminate redundant memory fetches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air, BP 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex Nice / FR | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Texas Instruments France Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laurenti, Gilbert 1490 Chemin De St. Etienne St. Paul de Vence 06570 / FR | 02 /
Gillet, Vincent 6 Chemin des moutons Le Rouret 06650 / FR | 03 /
Catan, Herve 411 Buckingham Road 1233 Richardson, Texas 75081 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited, European Patents Department (MS 13), PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00400687.0 | 10.03.2000 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160662 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G06F9/30047 (EP,US);
G06F9/3013 (EP,US);
G06F9/3816 (EP,US);
G06F9/3853 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/35] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Prozessor mit Verfolgen von Zeiger zur Eliminierung redundanter Speicherabholung | [2001/49] | English: | Processor with pointer tracking to eliminate redundant memory fetches | [2001/49] | French: | Processeur avec suivi de pointeur pour éliminer les extractions redondants de mémoire | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2007 | Request for further processing for: | 06.09.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2001 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8304137 (NCR CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,9-11 * column 1, line 40 - line 49 *; | [XY]EP0723221 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 22 - line 50 * * column 9, line 34 - line 40 * * column 12, line 43 - column 13, line 7 * [Y] 5; | [A]US5357618 (MIRZA JAMSHED H [US], et al) [A] 6,7 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 7 * | [Y] - BERGEY, JR., "Increased computer throughput by conditioned memory data prefetching", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, (197803), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, page 4103, XP002142900 [Y] 1-3,5,9-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "METHODS OF SPECIFYING DATA PREFETCHING WITHOUT USING A SEPARATE INSTRUCTION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19950601), vol. 38, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 355 - 356, XP000520692 [A] 5 * page 356, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | EP0723221 | WO8304137 |