EP1136486 - 2- I̊ndanylamino pyrimidone and 2- tetrahydronaphthalenylamino pyrimidone derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/39] | 2-[Indanylamino]pyrimidone and 2-[tetrahydronaphthalenylamino]pyrimidone derivatives | ||
[2007/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - English title | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Mitsubishi-Tokyo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi-Tokyo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almario-Garcia, Antonio 26, av. Roger Salengro 92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | 02 /
Frost, Jonathan Reid 12, rue du Parc 91320 Wissous / FR | 03 /
Li, Adrien-Tak 14, rue Bonnard 92260 Fontenay-aux-Roses / FR | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi-Synthélabo Service Brevets 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400808.2 | 23.03.2000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136486 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, A61K31/506, A61P25/28 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | 2-(Indanylamino)pyrimidon und 2-(Tetrahydronaphtalenylamino)pyrimidinon Derivate | [2001/39] | English: | 2- I̊ndanylamino pyrimidone and 2- tetrahydronaphthalenylamino pyrimidone derivatives | [2007/45] | French: | Dérivés de 2-(indanylamino)pyrimidinone et de 2-(tétrahydronaphtalénylamino)pyrimidione | [2001/39] |
Former [2001/39] | 2-[Indanylamino]pyrimidone and 2-[tetrahydronaphthalenylamino]pyrimidone derivatives | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9824782 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5 * page 0; claim - *; | JP7435633 [ ] (MORI,H.) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1975), vol. 83, no. 28, Database accession no. 10127z, page 853, column 2, XP002145638 [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * |