EP1041392 - On-board device and central device for accurate localisation of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roux, Raphael 41, rue de la Cavée 95100 Argenteuil / FR | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400872.8 | 30.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | FR19990004060 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: FR 9904060 | [2000/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041392 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041392 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14, G01S5/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04B7/18508 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | Im Fahrzeug eingebautes Gerät und zentrale Einrichtung zur genauen Positionsbestimmung eines Fahrzeugs | [2000/40] | English: | On-board device and central device for accurate localisation of a vehicle | [2000/40] | French: | Dispositif embarqué dans un véhicule et dispositif central pour localiser avec précision ce véhicule | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5132695 (DUMAS BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US5392052 (EBERWINE MARK A [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 61 * * claim - *; | [A]US5506587 (LANS HAKAN [SE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]GB2305568 (GPS GENETIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, lines 7-29 * * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 17 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 8 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,4-6,10-13,24,28 *; | [XA]US5767804 (MURPHY MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 2-58 * * column 5, lines 27-58 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, lines 42-60 * * column 11, lines 7-38 * * claim - * [A] 2 |