EP1052029 - Resonant device, such as beater or force generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2006/52] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states VIBRACHOC Parc d'Activités de l'Eglantier, CE 2804 Lisses F-91028 Evry Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noe, Mathieu 38 bis, rue Grande 77630 Barbizon / FR | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400996.5 | 11.04.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | FR19990005110 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9905110 | [2000/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052029 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052029 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/14, E02D3/068, F16F7/10 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
F16F7/1011 (EP,US);
B06B1/14 (EP,US);
E02D3/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Resonanzvorrichtung wie Schläger oder Krafterzeuger | [2000/46] | English: | Resonant device, such as beater or force generator | [2000/46] | French: | Dispositif résonant, tel que batteur ou générateur d'efforts | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | IE | 02.05.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 02.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01120453 ; | [A]DE2302098 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1* page 2, line 26 - line 31 *; | [X]EP0676559 (COOPER TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 29 - line 36 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890815), vol. 013, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 859), & JP01120453 A 19890512 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |