EP1059683 - Bussing structure in an electrochemical cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saft Finance S.à.r.l. 398, route d'Esch 1471 Luxembourg / LU | [2005/17] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romero, Antonio L. 32 Edelweiss Way Parkton, Maryland 21120 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401237.3 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990330009 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 330009 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059683 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059683 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059683 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/26 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H01M50/317 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (EP,US);
H01M50/538 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M50/367 (EP,US);
H01M50/534 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/28] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sammelschienenstruktur in einer elektrochemischen Zelle | [2000/50] | English: | Bussing structure in an electrochemical cell | [2000/50] | French: | Structure de collection omnibus dans une pile | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 24.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4767682 (DOROGI JOSEPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-35* claims 1-32 *; | [A]EP0822605 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) [A] 1-35 * claims 1-31 *; | [A]FR2752092 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) [A] 1-35 * claims 1-36 * |