EP1050480 - Diaphragm pump comprising a preferential deformation area on at least a part of its periphery, and container incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonningue, Philippe 42 rue Villiers de l'Isle Adam 75020 Paris / FR | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401241.5 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | FR19990005772 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9905772 | [2000/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050480 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050480 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/34 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
B05B11/1004 (EP,US);
B05B11/1001 (EP,US);
B05B11/1064 (EP,US);
B05B11/1076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Membranpumpe mit einer zumindest in einem Teilbereich der Peripherie befindlichen, bevorzugten Verformungszone, und damit ausgerüsteter Behälter | [2000/45] | English: | Diaphragm pump comprising a preferential deformation area on at least a part of its periphery, and container incorporating the same | [2000/45] | French: | Pompe à membrane comportant, sur au moins un secteur de sa périphérie, une zone de déformation préférentielle et récipient ainsi équipé | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IE | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | CY | 05.05.2005 | LU | 05.05.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4890773 (CORSETTE DOUGLAS F [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 17 - line 21; figures 3,5 *; | [AD]FR2728809 (CROSNIER DANIEL [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2728809 |