EP1056000 - Command procedure, from a dashboard on a client station, of a process running on a server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVIDIAN Rue Jean Jaurès BP 68 78340 Les Clayes sous Bois / FR | [2006/46] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78434 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baillif, Christian 7 bis avenue du Petit Chambord 92340 Bourg la Reine / FR | 02 /
Lassabe, Serge 62 rue Ferdinand Forest 92150 Suresne / FR | 03 /
Leyques, François 5 rue de Turenne 75004 Paris / FR | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay, 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | ||
Former [2005/10] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/48] | Denis, Hervé, et al BULL S.A. PC 58D20, 68, route de Versailles 78434 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401346.2 | 17.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | FR19990006520 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906520 | [2000/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056000 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/33] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerprozedur für einen Server-Prozess ausgehend von einem steuerpanel einer benutzerstation | [2000/48] | English: | Command procedure, from a dashboard on a client station, of a process running on a server | [2000/48] | French: | Procédé de commande, à partir d'un tableau de bord d'une station cliente, d'un processus s'exécutant sur un serveur | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0597395 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 48 * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 2; | [YA]EP0780756 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1,4,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 6-8; | [Y]US5276883 (HALLIWELL HARRY [GB]) [Y] 1,4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5831612 (STOVAL III WILLIAM MURRAY [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 10, line 20 - column 13, line 17 * [A] 3; | [A] - GOTTSCHALK K D, "TECHNICAL OVERVIEW OF IBM'S JAVA INITIATIVES", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL,US,IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, (19980101), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 308 - 322, XP000783104 [A] 5 * page 318, column L, paragraph 1 - page 319, column R, paragraph 4 * | [A] - NSICOM, "Integrated Systems, Inc. Welcomes NSIcom as a pRODUCTIVITY pARTNER for Java(TM)", PRESS RELEASE, http://www.nsicom.com/news/presrel4.htm, (19980331), XP002134601 [A] 5 * page 1, paragraph 2 * |