EP1058322 - Moving mechanism using a piezo-electric actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norbert Beyrard France (SARL) Résidence du Parc 170, avenue des Thermes 01220 Divonne-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Norbert Beyrard France (SARL) Résidence du Parc 170, avenue des Thermes 01220 Divonne-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Norbert Beyrard France (SARL) 18 rue Marbeuf 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Norbert Beyrard France (SARL) 18 rue Marboeuf 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyrard, Norbert 1 boulevard Richard Wallace 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [2005/09] |
Former [2000/49] | 01 /
Beyrard, Norbert 1 boulevard Richard Wallace 9220 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Representative(s) | Gaglione, Renaud Cabinet Michel Moinas 13, chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Gaglione, Renaud Cabinet Michel Moinas, 13, chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | ||
Former [2000/49] | Keib, Gérard Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401352.0 | 17.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | FR19990007101 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907101 | [2000/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058322 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058322 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1058322 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1058322 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H02N2/002 (EP,US);
H02N2/003 (EP,US);
H02N2/0065 (EP,US);
H02N2/026 (EP,US);
H01H57/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | Bewegungsmechanismus mit piezoelektrischen Antrieb | [2000/49] | English: | Moving mechanism using a piezo-electric actuator | [2000/49] | French: | Mécanisme de déplacement utilisant un organe d'actionnement piezo-électrique | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 22.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | IE | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | ES | 14.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04140074 ; | [A]JPS62254669 ; | [A]US5049775 (SMITS JOHANNES G [US]) |