EP1058280 - Method of producing chip inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Yoichiro, (A170) Intellectual Property Dep. Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd., 26-10 Tenjin, 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Takahiro, (A170) Intellectual Prop. Dep. Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd., 26-10 Tenjin, 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Komatsu, Hiroshi, (A170) Intellectual Prop. Dep. Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd., 26-10 Tenjin, 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 04 /
Morimoto, Tadashi, (A170) Intellectual Prop. Dep. Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd., 26-10 Tenjin, 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401539.2 | 31.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990151199 | 31.05.1999 Original published format: JP 15119999 | JP20000093104 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000093104 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058280 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058280 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/04, H01F41/10, H01F41/02, H01F17/04 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H01F17/045 (EP,US);
H01F41/04 (KR);
H01F41/0246 (EP,US);
H01F27/027 (EP,US);
H01F41/005 (EP,US);
H01F41/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49073 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49076 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine Chip-Induktivität | [2000/49] | English: | Method of producing chip inductor | [2000/49] | French: | Méthode pour produire une puce d'inductance | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.01.2005 | DE | 27.04.2005 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/18] | DE | 27.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58132907 ; | [A]JPH04165605 ; | [A]JPS5889807 ; | [A]JPH0488604 ; | [A]US4696100 (YAMAMOTO HIROMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5690771 (KATO IKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831028), vol. 007, no. 243, Database accession no. (E - 207), & JP58132907 A 19830808 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920928), vol. 016, no. 465, Database accession no. (E - 1270), & JP04165605 A 19920611 (TOKIN CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830816), vol. 007, no. 186, Database accession no. (E - 193), & JP58089807 A 19830528 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920710), vol. 016, no. 316, Database accession no. (E - 1231), & JP04088604 A 19920323 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |