EP1067715 - Apparatus for polarisation dispersion compensation in an optical transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penninckx, Denis 5, rue Pasteur 91620 Nozay / FR | 02 /
Lanne, Stéphanie 41, rue des Plantes 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Hamaide, Jean-Pierre 46bis, rue du Docteur L. Babin 91180 St Germain les Arpajon / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/02] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401698.6 | 15.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | FR19990008846 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9908846 | [2001/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067715 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/135, H04B10/18 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H04B10/25133 (EP,US);
H04B10/2572 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Polarisationsdispersionskompensierung in einem optischen Übertragungssystem | [2001/02] | English: | Apparatus for polarisation dispersion compensation in an optical transmission system | [2001/02] | French: | Dispositif de compensation de la dispersion de polarisation dans un système de transmission optique | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0716516 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 35 * * claims 1,19 *; | [A]EP0700178 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0716516 | EP0700178 |