EP1170860 - Improved multi-carrier receiver for radio telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Matra Cellular 1 Place des Frères Montgolfier 78928 Guyancourt Cédex 9 / FR | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calmel, Pierre Emmanuel 67 Boulevard Suchet F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Jacques, Roger 28 Rue de la Porte Dorée F-78320 Levis Saint Nom / FR | 03 /
Pidancier, Christian 400 rue des roseaux F-91640 Briis sous Forges / FR | 04 /
Fabrice, Robert 85, Boulevard Descartes F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 05 /
Georgeaux, Eric 12, rue Sully 78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co., Vilvoordsebaan 92 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 00401835.4 | 27.06.2000 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170860 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/20, H03F1/32 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
H04W52/362 (EP,US);
H03G3/3068 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W52/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Mehrträgersempfänger für einen Funktelekommunikationsnetzwerk | [2002/02] | English: | Improved multi-carrier receiver for radio telecommunications network | [2002/02] | French: | Récepteur amélioré à porteuses multiples pour un réseau de radiotélécommunication | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 19.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5451948 (JEKEL RICHARD N [US]) [A] 1,9,12 * abstract *; column 1, line 46 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 61 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5740524 (PACE GARY LEE [US], et al) [A] 1,9,12 * column 2, line 10 - line 30 * * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5862459 (CHARAS PHILIPPE [SE]) [X] 12 * abstract *; column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 22 * * figures 2,4 * [A] 1,9; | [XA]EP0926817 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 12 * abstract *; column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 57 * [A] 1,9 |