EP1065766 - Partially reflecting optical component and laser source using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetTest Photonics 45 avenue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes Sous Bois / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states NETTEST PHOTONICS 45 avenue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes Sous Bois / FR | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states PHOTONETICS 52 Avenue de l'Europe 78160 Marly le Roi / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graindorge, Philippe 8 rue du 19 Mars 1962 21800 Chevigny Saint Sauveur / FR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401845.3 | 28.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | FR19990008400 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9908400 | [2001/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065766 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065766 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/14, G02B5/122 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H01S5/141 (EP,US);
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B5/122 (EP,US);
H01S5/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/38] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Teilreflektierendes optisches Bauteil und dessen Verwendung in Laserquellen | [2003/43] | English: | Partially reflecting optical component and laser source using the same | [2001/01] | French: | Composant optique partiellement réfléchissant et source laser incorporant un tel composant | [2001/01] |
Former [2001/01] | Teilreflektierendes optisches Bauteil und dessen Verwendung in Laser Quellen | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0917261 (PHOTONETICS [FR]) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5799793 ; | [A]US5886785 (LEFEVRE HERVE [FR], et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820921), vol. 006, no. 185, Database accession no. (E - 132), & JP57099793 A 19820621 (TOMIJIMA TAKUMI) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | EP0702438 |