EP1065285 - Aluminum killed low carbon steel sheet for cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states SOLLAC Immeuble "La Pacific", 11/13 Cours Valmy, La Défense 7 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouzekri, Mohamed 24, rue Emile Zola 57120 Rombas / FR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2013/36] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELORMITTAL France Research & Development Intellectual Property Immeuble Le Cézanne 6, rue André Campra 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2007/09] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/24] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie USINOR Groupe Arcelor Direction de la Propriete Industrielle Immeuble "La Pacific" TSA 10001 92070 La Defense CEDEX / FR | ||
Former [2001/01] | Ventavoli, Roger USINOR, Direction Propriété Industrielle, Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense, 11/13 Cours Valmy, TSA 10001 92070 La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401868.5 | 30.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | FR19990008414 | 01.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9908414 | [2001/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065285 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065285 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1065285 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/04, C21D9/48 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C21D8/0468 (EP,US);
C21D9/48 (EP,US);
C21D8/0436 (EP,US);
C21D8/0473 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/02] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aluminiumberuhigtes, niedriggekohltes Stahlband für Behälter | [2001/01] | English: | Aluminum killed low carbon steel sheet for cans | [2001/01] | French: | Tôle d'acier à bas carbone calmé à l'aluminium pour emballage. | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 18.09.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2003
07.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Corus Staal BV PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL Opponent's representative Herman de Groot, Johan Willem, et al, et al Tata Steel Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2003
Corus Staal BV PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL Opponent's representative Herman de Groot, Johan Willem, et al, et al Corus Technology BV Corus Intellectual Property Department PO Box 10000 1970 CA Ijmuiden / NL | 15.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2013 | 12.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.04.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.12.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.06.2013 | Appeal received No. T1482/13 | 26.08.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 07.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T0906/06 | 11.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 23.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 30.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.05.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/36] | CY | 30.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56158822 ; | [A]FR2472021 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al); | [Y]GB2086425 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [Y] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0360955 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [Y]DE19622164 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820319), vol. 006, no. 044, Database accession no. (C - 095), & JP56158822 A 19811207 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] * abstract * | Opposition | US4698103 |