EP1070687 - Monolithic honeycomb structure made of porous ceramic material, and use as filter for particulates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states Céramiques Techniques et Industrielles S.A. La Resclause, Route de Saint-Privat, B.P. 34 30340 Salindres / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Institut Francais du Petrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Céramiques Techniques et Industrielles S.A. La Resclause, Route de Saint-Privat, B.P. 34 30340 Salindres / FR | |||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Céramiques Techniques et Industrielles S.A. La Resclause, Route de Saint-Privat, B.P. 34 30340 Salindres / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courty, Philippe 58, rue Jean-Baptiste Baudin 94800 Villejuif / FR | 02 /
Dementhon, Jean-Baptiste 4, rue de la Pierre Levée 75011 Paris / FR | 03 /
Joulin, Jean-Pierre 104, Chemin des Plans 34790 Grabels / FR | 04 /
Pourchet, Fabienne Rés. Lamartine II, Av. Paul Dumas 30340 Salindres / FR | [2001/04] | Application number, filing date | 00401876.8 | 30.06.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | FR19990009432 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909432 | [2001/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070687 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070687 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, F01N3/022 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24744 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/565, C04B35/6303, C04B38/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Monolitische Honigwabenstruktur aus porösem Keramikmaterial, und Verwendung als Partikelfilter | [2001/04] | English: | Monolithic honeycomb structure made of porous ceramic material, and use as filter for particulates | [2001/04] | French: | Structure monolithe nid d'abeilles en matériau céramique poreux, et utilisation comme filtre à particules | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 05.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | CY | 10.09.2003 | IE | 10.09.2003 | NL | 10.09.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | PT | 18.12.2003 | ES | 21.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 10.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH04187578 [ ] (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A] - Y. OHASHI ET AL., "Porous silicon carbide sintered ceramics for exhaust emission control devices and their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930503), vol. 118, no. 18, Database accession no. 174403d, XP000391197 [A] 1-20 * abstract * |