EP1145683 - Instrument for bovine annular protuberance sampling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarl Artbois 261 rue de l'Eglise 76520 Boos / FR | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legeai, Thierry 261, rue de l'Eglise 76520 Boos / FR | 02 /
Venturini, Maurice 73, rue de la République 76200 Dieppe / FR | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philipp Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401879.2 | 30.06.2000 | [2001/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145683 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145683 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B10/025 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61D1/00 (EP,US);
A61B10/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/320708 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | Instrument zur Probeentnahme von der Protuberancia annularis | [2001/42] | English: | Instrument for bovine annular protuberance sampling | [2001/42] | French: | Ustensile pour le prélèvement de la protubérance annulaire d'un bovin | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE DEMAPLAST S.r.l. Via 1* Maggio, 16/22 29010 Pianello V.T. (PC) / IT Opponent's representative La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 20122 Milano / IT | [2005/40] | 28.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2007 | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.12.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/16] | Request for further processing for: | 05.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2004 | ES | 24.11.2004 | FI | 24.11.2004 | GB | 24.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | DE | 25.02.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | CY | 30.06.2005 | LU | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
IT | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
CY | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
CY | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
DE | 25.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2588748 (BLAGOVESCHENSKY G [SU]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 3, line 18 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [X]US4800896 (JALOWAYSKI ALFREDO A [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 3; figure 3 *; | [A]US4984367 (ALBANESE JOSEPH [US]) [A] 4* figure 1 *; | [A]US5084005 (KACHIGIAN CORRINNE S [US]) [A] 7 * column 6, line 33 - line 38; figure 7 *; | [X]US5348023 (MCLUCAS BRUCE [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 9 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19745847 (KRUEGER PAUL DR MED [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 4 - line 9; figure 4 * |