EP1067232 - Washing and/or drying machine with a drum speed controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIAPEM 137, rue de Gerland F-69007 - Lyon / FR | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girin, Lionel, Thomson-CSF P.I. Dépt. Brevets 13, av. du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
Filley, Thierry, Thomson-CSF P.I. Dépt. Brevets 13, av. du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 03 /
Vivion, Daniel, Thomson-CSF P.I. Dépt. Brevets 13, av. du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/02] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401917.0 | 04.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | FR19990008957 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9908957 | [2001/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067232 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/30 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
D06F37/304 (EP,US);
D06F33/56 (EP,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/39] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasch- und/oder Trocknungsmaschine mit einer Trommeldrehzahlsteuerung | [2001/02] | English: | Washing and/or drying machine with a drum speed controller | [2001/02] | French: | Machine à laver et/ou à sécher le linge équipée d'une régulation de vitesse de tambour | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 11.07.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2454625 (BAUKNECHT GMBH G [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,10 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]DE3306052 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10 * abstract *; | [A]FR2588581 (CIAPEM [FR]) [A] 1,4 * figure .; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]FR2655065 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,8,10* figure -; claim - * |