EP1174744 - Method and apparatus for splicing optical fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverside Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herve, Patrick Jean Pierre, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP TI 3-1 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 02 /
Tian, Yong, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP TI 3-1 Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00402079.8 | 21.07.2000 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174744 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, G02B6/255 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
G02B6/2555 (EP,US);
G02B6/2551 (EP,US);
G02B6/2553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/43] |
Former [2002/41] | FR | ||
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spleissen optischer Fasern | [2002/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for splicing optical fibers | [2002/04] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour épisser des fibres optiques | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]JPH04221908 ; | [X]EP0244004 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,19 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 4 *; | [XA]EP0462710 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 23; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 5,7,9-11,13,14; | [A]EP0568382 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 15* abstract * | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921211), vol. 016, no. 571, Database accession no. (P - 1459), & JP04221908 A 19920812 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1,3-11,13,14 * abstract * [X] 19 |