EP1077083 - Catalyst comprising at least one zeolite of the NES structural type and rhenium and the transalkylation of aromatic hydrocarbons using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2006/25] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merlen, Elisabeth 3, rue Bequet 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Alario, Fabio 16, rue de l'Eglise 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | 03 /
Ferrer, Nathalie 12, rue des Balastières 78360 Montesson / FR | 04 /
Martin, Olivia 42, avenue Lénine 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/51] |
Former [2001/08] | Andréeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402217.4 | 03.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | FR19990010652 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: FR 9910652 | [2001/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077083 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077083 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/04, C01B39/02, C07C6/12, B01J29/78 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
C07C6/126 (EP,US);
B01J29/076 (KR);
B01J23/16 (KR);
B01J23/46 (KR);
B01J29/74 (EP,US);
B01J29/78 (EP,US);
B01J2229/16 (EP,US);
B01J2229/26 (EP,US);
B01J2229/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2001/46] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Katalysator, zumindest eine Zeolite des NES-Typs enthaltend, und Rhenium und seiner Verwendung für die Transalkylierung von aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [2005/51] | English: | Catalyst comprising at least one zeolite of the NES structural type and rhenium and the transalkylation of aromatic hydrocarbons using the same | [2001/08] | French: | Catalyseur comprenant au moins une zéolite de type structural NES et du rhénium et son utilisation en transalkylation d'hydrocarbures alkylaromatiques | [2001/08] |
Former [2001/08] | Katalysator, zumindest eine Zeolite des NES-Typs enthaltend, und Rhenium und seiner Verwendung für die Tranalkylierung von aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | Examination procedure | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0925822 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 1,4,7,10,11 * claims 5,24 * [Y] 2,3,14-21; | [Y]FR2765237 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 2,14-17 * claims 1,2,12-15 *; | [A]US5254787 (DESSAU RALPH M [US]); | [Y]EP0825151 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 2,3,18-21 * claims 1-25 * |