EP1077467 - Flat plasma discharge display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hironobu, Abe, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402279.4 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | JP19990229867 | 16.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22986799 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077467 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
H01J11/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/26 (KR);
H01J11/36 (KR);
H01J11/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/46] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flache Plasmaentladungs-Anzeigevorrichtung | [2001/08] | English: | Flat plasma discharge display device | [2001/08] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage plat à décharge plasma | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 22.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0920048 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,8 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 39 * * column 34, line 27 - line 53; figure 26 *; | [X]JPH04181633 ; | [X]US3801851 (ANDOH S, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 35; figures 7,8 *; | [X]JPH01137537 ; | [X]JPH07182979 ; | [A]JPH05101781 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921012), vol. 016, no. 492, Database accession no. (E - 1278), & JP04181633 A 19920629 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890829), vol. 013, no. 390, Database accession no. (E - 813), & JP01137537 A 19890530 (YOSHIFUMI AMANO) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07182979 A 19950721 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930818), vol. 017, no. 450, Database accession no. (E - 1416), & JP05101781 A 19930423 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |