EP1086945 - Composition containing a cyclohexane derivative, compound and use thereof for structuring the composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Livoreil, Aude 16 rue du Dragon 75006 Paris / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Dodin, Catherine L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Dodin, Catherine L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402369.3 | 28.08.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | FR19990011773 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911773 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086945 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086945 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/58, A61K7/48, A61K47/48 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C07C233/58 (EP,US);
A61K8/0229 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Cyclohexanderivat, Verbindung und deren Verwendung zur Strukturierung einer Zusammensetzung | [2001/13] | English: | Composition containing a cyclohexane derivative, compound and use thereof for structuring the composition | [2001/13] | French: | Composition comprenant un composé dérivé de cyclohexane, composé et utilisation dudit composé pour structurer une composition | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.2002 | FI | 09.10.2002 | GR | 09.10.2002 | IE | 09.10.2002 | NL | 09.10.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | PT | 09.01.2003 | SE | 09.01.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2004/01] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
FI | 09.10.2002 | ||
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
FI | 09.10.2002 | ||
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 09.10.2002 | |
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 09.01.2003 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10212213 ; | [A]JPH10273477 ; | [A]JPH10237034 ; | [AD]EP0291334 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 17-21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10212213 A 19980811 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10273477 A 19981013 (HANABUSA KENJI;POLA CHEM IND INC) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10237034 A 19980908 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [A] 1,20 * abstract * |