EP1095689 - Installation for cyclic treatment of fluid by adsorption, comprising valves with improved tightness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monereau, Christian 159, rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Belot, Jean-Marc 8, Villa des Fleurs, 59, boulevard de Champigny 94210 St Maur / FR | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402649.8 | 25.09.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | FR19990013517 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9913517 | [2001/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095689 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095689 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/047, C01B13/02, F16K41/00, F16K17/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
F16K41/046 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur zyklischen Behandlung eines Fluids durch Adsorption, die Ventile mit verbesserter Dichtigkeit enthält | [2001/18] | English: | Installation for cyclic treatment of fluid by adsorption, comprising valves with improved tightness | [2001/18] | French: | Installation de traitement cyclique de fluide par adsorption avec vannes à étanchéité améliorée | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | IE | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | LU | 25.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | CH | 30.09.2007 | LI | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2455233 (DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [DA]US5223004 (ETEVE SYLVIE [FR], et al) [DA] 1-13 * column W * |