EP1192850 - Improvements to conveyor means for a fruit harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Holland Braud S.A. L'Elinière, Route d'Aizenay 85220 Coex / FR | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mérant, Jean Camille La Faverie 85220 La Chapelle-Hermier / FR | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 00402702.5 | 02.10.2000 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192850 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192850 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01D46/28 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
A01D46/00 (EP,US);
A01D46/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Fördermittel einer Fruchterntemaschine | [2002/14] | English: | Improvements to conveyor means for a fruit harvester | [2002/14] | French: | Amélioration des moyens d'acheminement d'une récolteuse de fruits | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 16.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | CY | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | LU | 02.10.2004 | IE | 04.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
CY | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
LU | 02.10.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2298266 (PROU JOSEPH [FR]) [DA] 1-21 * page 2, line 7 - page 5, line 8; figure - *; | [A]FR2589371 (GROS PIERRE [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0893049 (NEW HOLLAND BRAUD SA [FR]) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 44; figure - * |