EP1103702 - Process of controlling a particle filter and a process of controlling an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Archimbaud, Marie Laure 154 avenue Parmentier 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
Hekimian, Georges 77 rue P.V. Couturier 92300 Levallois / FR | 03 /
Meurisse, Olivier 21 rue des Iris 92160 Anthony / FR | 04 /
Chaumeaux, Romuald 42 route Nationale 95510 Lardy / FR | 05 /
Marcelly, Bruno 28 rue des Trois Fermes 91400 Orsay / FR | [2001/22] | Application number, filing date | 00403210.8 | 17.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | FR19990014889 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914889 | FR19990014890 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914890 | [2001/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103702 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103702 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103702 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, F01N3/029, F02D41/14, F02D41/38, F02D33/02 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
F01N3/029 (EP);
F01N9/002 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP);
F02D41/1448 (EP);
F01N2430/06 (EP);
F01N2550/04 (EP);
F01N2610/01 (EP);
F02D2200/0812 (EP);
F02D2250/18 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2002/35] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Regelungverfahren eines Partikelfilters und Regelungsverfahren einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/22] | English: | Process of controlling a particle filter and a process of controlling an internal combustion engine | [2001/22] | French: | Procédé de gestion du fonctionnement d'un filtre à particules et d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 12.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5287698 (SHINZAWA MOTOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 17, line 31 - column 19, line 5; figures 22-24 *; | [A]FR2668203 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 9 * abstract *; | [X]DE19618691 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 11-13 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 41; figure 2 *; | [DA]FR2774421 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [DA] 11 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 32 * * abstract *; | [A]US5941743 (KATO MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 11 * abstract *; | [A]US5138835 (BENDER FRANZ [DE], et al) [A] 11 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2774421 | FR2781251 |