EP1107421 - Electronic apparatus including remote control receiving system and AC adapter system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masafumi, Kikuchi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tadashi, Oomura, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Genichiro, Oga, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403341.1 | 29.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990339277 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33927799 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1107421 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H02J9/005 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (KR);
H04B1/3883 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N5/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ein Empfangssystem für Fernbedienungssignalen und ein AC Adaptationssystem a umfassendes elektronisches Gerät | [2001/24] | English: | Electronic apparatus including remote control receiving system and AC adapter system | [2001/24] | French: | Appareil électronique comprenant un système de réception pour des signaux de télécommande et système d' adaptation pour AC | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 14.12.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5869949 (NISHIKAWA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US5889382 (JUNG YEON-TAK [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0685975 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) |